Global Patent Index - EP 1134734 A8

EP 1134734 A8 2001-12-05 - Optical disc on which pre-pits are recorded

Title (en)

Optical disc on which pre-pits are recorded

Title (de)

Optische Platte auf der Pre-pits aufgezeichnet sind

Title (fr)

Disque optique sur lequel des prepits sont enregistrés

Publication

EP 1134734 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 01104928 A

Priority

JP 2000077031 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1134734A2] An optical disc of the present invention has a plurality of kinds of pre-pits (P1) with a correction size which have a length only uniformly shorter than a plurality of pre-pits (P2) with a specified correctional size which have a constant width, a constant depth and a constant depth inclination and a different length in correspondence to the data thereby recording the data with the pre-pits with the correction size. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/004 (2006.01); G11B 7/005 (2006.01); G11B 7/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24085 (2013.01); G11B 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1134734 A2 20010919; EP 1134734 A3 20020814; EP 1134734 A8 20011205; JP 2001266413 A 20010928; US 2001030927 A1 20011018

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUMARU, MASAAKI

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI