Global Patent Index - EP 1135303 B1

EP 1135303 B1 2002-09-11 - PLASTIC RECEPTACLE WITH LID

Title (en)

PLASTIC RECEPTACLE WITH LID

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER MIT DECKEL

Title (fr)

CONTENANT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE COMPORTANT UN COUVERCLE

Publication

EP 1135303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963218 A

Priority

  • DE 9903605 W
  • DE 19855361 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19855361A1] Disclosed is a plastic receptacle having a lid (1). The receptacle comprises an upper edge and the lid (1) comprises an area (2) encompassing said upper edge. Said area (2) comprises a side (3) which radially faces inwards. The lid also comprises a middle area (4) surrounded by said first area (2) and an outer area (5) extending downwards. Furthermore, the lid (1) is provided with box-type projections (6) on its side (3) which radially faces inwards. The aim of the invention is to achieve better centring and better stability of the stacked-up receptacles having lids (1) by maintaining a low stack height of the lids (1). To this end, the side (3) of the lid (1) which faces radially inwards has a surrounding terracing (7) which has approximately the same width as the box-type projections (6) and said box-type projections (6) are arranged on the terracing (7) and extend to the upper edge of the encompassing area (2) of the lid (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/06 (2006.01); B65D 43/00 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00027 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00518 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0099 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19855361 A1 20000608; DE 19855361 C2 20030528; AT 223848 T 20020915; AU 1963100 A 20000619; BG 105656 A 20020430; BG 64149 B1 20040227; CA 2353537 A1 20000608; CA 2353537 C 20050412; CZ 20011891 A3 20020313; CZ 291976 B6 20030618; DK 1135303 T3 20030120; EE 04522 B1 20050815; EE 200100299 A 20030217; EP 1135303 A1 20010926; EP 1135303 B1 20020911; ES 2183638 T3 20030316; GE P20032993 B 20030110; HR P20010490 A2 20020831; HR P20010490 B1 20030430; HU 0105059 A2 20020529; HU 0105059 A3 20021128; HU 223969 B1 20050329; MA 25273 A1 20011001; NO 20012515 A 20010717; NO 20012515 D0 20010522; NO 321692 B1 20060619; PL 197145 B1 20080331; PL 347933 A1 20020422; PT 1135303 E 20030131; RU 2214957 C2 20031027; SK 286350 B6 20080707; SK 7412001 A3 20011106; TR 200101537 T2 20011221; UA 67816 C2 20010917; US 6840398 B1 20050111; WO 0032490 A1 20000608; YU 39401 A 20030131; YU 49163 B 20040312

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151113

2017-02-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170228

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020404236

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151113

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-08-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-07-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223848 T

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-27 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902694

2016-05-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20141106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-11-07 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20070630

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SUPERFOS A/S

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SUPERFOS A/S

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183638 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404236

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021209

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902694 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223848 T 20020915

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT;LV;RO;SI