Global Patent Index - EP 1136017 B1

EP 1136017 B1 2003-06-25 - Method and device for melting ends of bristles

Title (en)

Method and device for melting ends of bristles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verschmelzen von Faserenden

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fusion des extrêmités de poils

Publication

EP 1136017 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106375 A

Priority

  • EP 01106375 A
  • EP 00105386 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136017A1] The stamp is heated in its mass, by a controlled flow of electrical current. An Independent claim is included for the machine carrying out the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 3/04; A46B 3/06; A46D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/06 (2006.01); A46D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/06 (2013.01); A46D 3/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136017 A1 20010926; EP 1136017 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070319

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200997 T3

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100326 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI