Global Patent Index - EP 1136024 A3

EP 1136024 A3 2003-06-25 - Disc-shaped cosmetic pad

Title (en)

Disc-shaped cosmetic pad

Title (de)

Scheibenartiges Kosmetik-Pad

Title (fr)

Tampon cosmétique en forme de disque

Publication

EP 1136024 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01106634 A

Priority

DE 20005170 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136024A2] The disk-shaped cosmetic pad (1), of a soft material, has a flexible cladding (2) on one side of plastics, rubber, and the like. The cladding has an abrasive surface. The cladding material contains grinding particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 7/02; A45D 44/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 44/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 44/00 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20005170 U1 20000525; EP 1136024 A2 20010926; EP 1136024 A3 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 7/02 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45D 44/00 B

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI