Global Patent Index - EP 1136213 A3

EP 1136213 A3 2003-06-04 - Process and installation for automatic production of hollow bodies out of a mixture

Title (en)

Process and installation for automatic production of hollow bodies out of a mixture

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur automatisierten Herstellung von Hohlkörpern aus Mischgut

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication automatique de corps creux à partir d'un mélange

Publication

EP 1136213 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01101147 A

Priority

DE 10013824 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10013824C1] The manufacturing method has fresh concrete supplied to a mold space between a mold core (10) and a mold mantle (9), with uniform distribution of the concrete, compression via vibration and formation of an upper centering end by pressing an upper cuff into the concrete column. The obtained molded concrete body is removed from the mold by vertical extraction and transported to a drying station. The mold components are assembled at a pre-assembly station before transfer to the molding station, with automatic separation of mold components at the molding station dependent on the molding requirements and subsequent re-assembly before transfer from the molding station. An independent claim for a hollow concrete component manufacturing plant is also included.

[origin: DE10013824C1] The manufacturing method has fresh concrete supplied to a mold space between a mold core (10) and a mold mantle (9), with uniform distribution of the concrete, compression via vibration and formation of an upper centering end by pressing an upper cuff into the concrete column. The obtained molded concrete body is removed from the mold by vertical extraction and transported to a drying station. The mold components are assembled at a pre-assembly station before transfer to the molding station, with automatic separation of mold components at the molding station dependent on the molding requirements and subsequent re-assembly before transfer from the molding station. An Independent claim for a hollow concrete component manufacturing plant is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/00; B28B 17/00; B28B 21/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01); B28B 21/14 (2006.01); B28B 21/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/0014 (2013.01); B28B 17/009 (2013.01); B28B 21/14 (2013.01); B28B 21/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 3803637 A1 19890817 - PRINZING GEORG GMBH CO KG [DE]
  • [DA] WO 9857786 A1 19981223 - PEDERSHAAB AS [DK], et al
  • [A] FR 989845 A 19510913
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 197720, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P64, AN 1977-E1550Y, XP002234622
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 198642, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P64, AN 1986-277683, XP002234623

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136213 A2 20010926; EP 1136213 A3 20030604; DE 10013824 C1 20010906; US 2003205833 A1 20031106; US 2005098705 A1 20050512

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060429

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 7/00 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 21/82 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 17/00 B

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI