Global Patent Index - EP 1136259 B1

EP 1136259 B1 2007-10-31 - Applicator device for locally applying viscous or liquid materials in defined quantity

Title (en)

Applicator device for locally applying viscous or liquid materials in defined quantity

Title (de)

Auftragevorrichtung zum lokalen Auftragen viskoser oder flüssiger Materialien in definierter Menge

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer localement de matériaux visqueux ou liquide en quantité définie

Publication

EP 1136259 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105517 A

Priority

DE 10014869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136259A2] A coating device for localized application of a viscous or liquid material (11) in definite amounts has an uptake element (10) taking up the material (11) by a capillary and/or adhesion effect and depositing it on the substrate, again by a capillary and/or adhesion effect.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136259 A2 20010926; EP 1136259 A3 20031105; EP 1136259 B1 20071031; AT 376931 T 20071115; DE 10014869 A1 20010927; DE 50113180 D1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH

2015-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113180

2015-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113180

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES GMBH

- Free text: ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES GMBH#AUF DER MORGENSTELLE 15#72076 TUEBINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES GMBH#AUF DER MORGENSTELLE 15#72076 TUEBINGEN (DE)

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080306

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113180 P 20071213

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARSAN, NICOLAE, DR.

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAIBLE, STEFAN, DR.

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIMAR, UDO, DR.

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARSAN, NICOLAE, DR.

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAIBLE, STEFAN, DR.

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIMAR, UDO, DR.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARSAN, NICOLAE, DR.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAIBLE, STEFAN, DR.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIMAR, UDO, DR.

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES GMBH

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADVANCED SENSING DEVICES GMBH

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI