Global Patent Index - EP 1136351 A3

EP 1136351 A3 2002-11-20 - Changeable set-up watertight diving suit

Title (en)

Changeable set-up watertight diving suit

Title (de)

Wasserdichter Tauchanzug mit veränderbarer Anpassung

Title (fr)

Combinaison de plongée étanche à l'eau avec adaptation changeable

Publication

EP 1136351 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00116731 A

Priority

IT GE20000045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136351A2] Watertight diving suit (1) with changeable set-up, of the type including at least one air charging valve (12) connected to a compressed air source (2) and at least one air discharging valve (3, 4, 5); in said diving suit (1) is provided a pneumatic control device (7, 8, 9, 11) controlling independently both said charging valve (12), for the introduction of the air into the diving suit (1), and said discharging valve (3, 4, 5), for the exhausting of the air from the diving suit (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/08 (2013.01); B63C 2011/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136351 A2 20010926; EP 1136351 A3 20021120; IT 1314513 B1 20021218; IT GE20000045 A1 20010924; IT GE20000045 D0 20000324

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090331

2006-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARES S.P.A.

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI