Global Patent Index - EP 1136352 A3

EP 1136352 A3 2002-11-20 - Mouthpiece for regulator

Title (en)

Mouthpiece for regulator

Title (de)

Mundstück für Druckregler

Title (fr)

Embouchure pour régulateur

Publication

EP 1136352 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01106529 A

Priority

IT GE20000047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136352A2] Mouthpiece for the regulator of an underwater breathing apparatus, comprising a tubular pipe (1; 4), for attachment at one end to the supply line (10) of the regulator by suitable clamping means (3), and having at the other end means (2) for insertion into the mouth, these being made integrally with the said tubular pipe (1; 4) of elastomeric material, the mouthpiece being characterized in that attached to the said pipe is a stiffener (101; 104) providing stiffening along the axial direction of the said pipe (1; 4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136352 A2 20010926; EP 1136352 A3 20021120; IT 1314515 B1 20021218; IT GE20000047 A1 20010924; IT GE20000047 D0 20000324

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI