Global Patent Index - EP 1136430 A3

EP 1136430 A3 2003-06-04 - Lift truck or attachment for a lift truck with a turning device

Title (en)

Lift truck or attachment for a lift truck with a turning device

Title (de)

Hublader oder Anbaugerät für einen Hublader mit einem Drehgerät

Title (fr)

Chariot élévateur ou accessoire pour chariot élévateur avec un dispositif de retournement

Publication

EP 1136430 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01106285 A

Priority

DE 10013359 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136430A2] The truck or fitting has a rotary device (30) enabling loads (20) being transported on a support or in jaws (15) to be held in various orientations. The rotary device can be turned in both directions and through more than 180 degrees and is driven by hydraulic fluid that is cut off when linkages reach elements on fixed points of the truck (10). Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of controlling a rotary device for a lifting truck or fitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/18; B66F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/12 (2006.01); B66F 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/184 (2013.01); B66F 9/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] EP 0911295 A2 19990428 - CASCADE CORP [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 697 (M - 1532) 20 December 1993 (1993-12-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 697 (M - 1532) 20 December 1993 (1993-12-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 697 (M - 1532) 20 December 1993 (1993-12-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136430 A2 20010926; EP 1136430 A3 20030604; DE 10013359 A1 20011004; US 2001024610 A1 20010927

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66F 9/18 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66F 9/12 B

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI