Global Patent Index - EP 1136576 B1

EP 1136576 B1 2004-12-29 - Bottom pour electroslag refining systems with controlled electric current path

Title (en)

Bottom pour electroslag refining systems with controlled electric current path

Title (de)

Elektro-Schlacke-Umschmelzsysteme mit Bodenausguss und kontrolliertem Elektrostrompfad

Title (fr)

Systèmes de fusion sous laitier électroconducteur à orifice de coulée au fond et circulation contrôlée du courant électrique

Publication

EP 1136576 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00302292 A

Priority

EP 00302292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136576A1] A bottom pour electroslag refining system (50) refines raw material into refined liquid metal. The bottom pour electroslag refining system (50) comprises an electroslag refining crucible (18); a slag (14); a bottom pour structure (12) that comprises an orifice (13) from which refined liquid metal from the electroslag refining crucible (18) can flow as a stream (25) of refined liquid metal; and a current path (27). The current path (27) is defined in the bottom pour electroslag refining system (50) for applying current to the raw material for melting and refining the raw material. The melted and refined raw material forms a refined liquid metal pool (15) in the electroslag refining crucible (18). The current that is applied by the current path is sufficient to provide the refined liquid metal in the refined liquid metal pool (15) with a viscosity under which the refined liquid metal can flow through the orifice (13) under its own viscosity. The electroslag refining crucible may comprise a split-crucible with electrical insulation between an upper and lower split-crucible portion, wherein the current path comprises the upper-split crucible portion, the slag and the lower split-crucible portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/18; B22D 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 23/10 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01); B22D 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136576 A1 20010926; EP 1136576 B1 20041229; DE 60017077 D1 20050203; DE 60017077 T2 20051229

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

- Free text: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#1 RIVER ROAD#SCHENECTADY, NY 12345 (US) -TRANSFER TO- GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY#1 RIVER ROAD#SCHENECTADY, NY 12345 (US)

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017077 P 20050203

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031030

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI