Global Patent Index - EP 1136626 A3

EP 1136626 A3 2003-06-04 - Rotary snow cutter with at least one cylindrical milling cutter body

Title (en)

Rotary snow cutter with at least one cylindrical milling cutter body

Title (de)

Schneefräse mit mindestens einem walzenförmigen Fräskörper

Title (fr)

Fraise à neige avec au moins un corps de fraise cylindrique

Publication

EP 1136626 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105846 A

Priority

DE 10013481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10013481C1] The snow blower has at least one rotating roller (5) to clear the snow, connected to a drive. It rotates on a horizontal axis (6) on two end bearing mountings (4) in a frame (1). At least one free cutter (15), with an axial length of 50-200 mm, is outside the bearing mounting (4) and keyed to the rotating roller (5). The free cutter (15) has the same diameter as the roller (5), and is pushed on to the roller journal at the bearing (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 5/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/098 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136626 A2 20010926; EP 1136626 A3 20030604; EP 1136626 B1 20060614; AT 330074 T 20060715; DE 10013481 C1 20010906; DE 50110094 D1 20060727; PL 198800 B1 20080731; PL 346440 A1 20010924

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110094 P 20060727

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050504

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030712

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI