Global Patent Index - EP 1136635 A3

EP 1136635 A3 2001-12-19 - Flat support means made of ceramic material

Title (en)

Flat support means made of ceramic material

Title (de)

Flächige Stützmittel aus keramischem Material

Title (fr)

Moyens de support plats en matière céramique

Publication

EP 1136635 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01106032 A

Priority

IT MO20000053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136635A2] Support means obtained by casting ceramic material comprises quadrangular plate means (2) and border toroidal means (3), said toroidal means (3) being arranged on at least three sides of said quadrangular plate means (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/16; B28B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136635 A2 20010926; EP 1136635 A3 20011219; IT 1317616 B1 20030715; IT MO20000053 A1 20010921

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050831

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020509

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI