Global Patent Index - EP 1136645 B1

EP 1136645 B1 2007-10-17 - Fire resisting door

Title (en)

Fire resisting door

Title (de)

Brandschutztor

Title (fr)

Porte coupe-feu

Publication

EP 1136645 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01890023 A

Priority

AT 4522000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136645A2] The sectional door (1) consists of panels (3) hinged together (2). Each panel consists of a metal shell (4) and an insulated filling (5). The abutting parts (8) between the panels are sealed and contain fire-protection laminates. The inside and outside of the abutting parts are each by covered by covering strips (11,12) fixed to one of the panels and covering the other. Covering strips swiveling on a swivel axis parallel with the hinge-axis grip over the inside of the hinges. The covering strips consist o f an outer sheet metal casing (13) and an inner layer of insulating material(14).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E06B 3/88 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01); E06B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136645 A2 20010926; EP 1136645 A3 20020724; EP 1136645 B1 20071017; AT 408247 B 20010925; AT A4522000 A 20010215; DE 50113132 D1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-08-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113132 P 20071129

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEHENFELDER, FRANZ

2007-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PENEDER IMMOBILIEN GMBH

2007-05-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIRE RESISTING DOOR

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060822

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI