Global Patent Index - EP 1136658 A3

EP 1136658 A3 2001-12-19 - Camshaft phasing device

Title (en)

Camshaft phasing device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verstellung einer Nockenwelle

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage du calage d'un arbre à cames

Publication

EP 1136658 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01890071 A

Priority

AT 3902000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001020461A1] The invention relates to an apparatus for adjusting a camshaft of an internal combustion engine with at least one electromotor which, by way of a gear, produces the adjustment of the camshaft with respect to a pinion, with the gear comprising a planet cage on which at least one planet wheel is provided which is driven by an electromotor. A rapid adjustment with a simple arrangement at the same time can be achieved in such a way that several planet wheels are provided which are in engagement with a ring gear and that each planet wheel is associated with an electromotor which drives the same via a common shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/352; F01L 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/352 (2006.01); F16H 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136658 A2 20010926; EP 1136658 A3 20011219; AT 408897 B 20020325; AT A3902000 A 20010815; JP 2001280107 A 20011010; US 2001020461 A1 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI