Global Patent Index - EP 1136762 A3

EP 1136762 A3 2002-11-06 - Device for automatically controlling an air maintenance system

Title (en)

Device for automatically controlling an air maintenance system

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung eines Luftwartungssystems

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la commande automatique d'un système d'entretien d'air

Publication

EP 1136762 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01302697 A

Priority

GB 0007091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1136762A2] A device (10) for automatically controlling an air maintenance system (12) is disclosed. The device uses a Passive Infra-Red (PIR) detector (14) to count the number of movements within an enclosed space during a specified time period. Readings from a temperature sensor (16) may also be included. A processor (18) then estimates the number of people within the enclosed space and thereby activates the air maintenance system (12) at a suitable activation level. Preferably, a PIR detector (14) with no latching-on period is provided. Communication between the processor (18) and the air maintenance system is preferably by way of a radio transceiver (32). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 2120/10 (2018.01); F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 2120/14 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1136762 A2 20010926; EP 1136762 A3 20021106; GB 0007091 D0 20000517; GB 2360606 A 20010926

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI