Global Patent Index - EP 1137868 B1

EP 1137868 B1 2004-12-22 - ELECTROMAGNETIC OR ELECTROHYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC OR ELECTROHYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE ODER ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE VENTILSTEUERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ELECTROMAGNETIQUE DE COMMANDE A SOUPAPES

Publication

EP 1137868 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00971321 A

Priority

  • DE 19948205 A
  • DE 10009299 A
  • EP 0009752 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0125599A1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic or electrohydraulic valve control device. According to the invention, a sealed chamber (2) is formed above the cylinder head, and the actuators, which are mounted on supports, of at least one part of the inlet and outlet valves are accommodated in said chamber that is sealed from the outside by a cover (11). The cover is at least partially flown around by a coolant having a lower temperature than engine oil or engine cooling water, e.g. by the intake air of the intake tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0125599 A1 20010412; EP 1137868 A1 20011004; EP 1137868 B1 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009028

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061020

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009028 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031031

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE