Global Patent Index - EP 1138231 A3

EP 1138231 A3 2002-11-13 - Exchangeable picture frame

Title (en)

Exchangeable picture frame

Title (de)

Wechselrahmen

Title (fr)

Cadre pour image échangeable

Publication

EP 1138231 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01106661 A

Priority

DE 20005195 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001023549A1] A changeable frame for supporting flat surfaced items such as pictures, posters, placards or the like, is provided, which includes a plurality of frame border strips which collectively form the border of the changeable frame. Each frame border strip includes a base profile member and a cover member movable between a closed item retaining position in which an item is retained by the changeable frame and the cover member partially extends over and exerts a resilient biasing force against the item and an open position. Each frame border strip also includes a pivot arrangement for pivotally mounting the base profile member and the cover member to one another. The pivot arrangement includes a fulcrum formed on the base profile member which is contacted by a counter stop surface formed on the cover member to prevent an overpivot movement of the cover member beyond its predetermined pivot travel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 1/06; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/06 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/0611 (2013.01); G09F 15/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20005195 U1 20000608; EP 1138231 A2 20011004; EP 1138231 A3 20021113; US 2001023549 A1 20010927; US 6553705 B2 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47G 1/06 A, 7G 09F 15/00 B

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI