Global Patent Index - EP 1139182 B1

EP 1139182 B1 2007-10-03 - Reserve power indicating mechanism and timepiece provided with such a mechanism

Title (en)

Reserve power indicating mechanism and timepiece provided with such a mechanism

Title (de)

Anzeigemechanismus der Gangreserve einer Uhr und mit diesem Mechanismus versehene Uhr

Title (fr)

Mécanisme indicateur de réserve de marche et montre munie d'un tel mécanisme

Publication

EP 1139182 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00106573 A

Priority

EP 00106573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001349962A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To make actual winding-up of a power spring correspond to the degree of winding of the power spring of an indicating hand without causing a difference. SOLUTION: The stored power display device mechanism is used for the movement of a time piece of the type that has a power source by means of the power spring. This mechanism has a frame, the stored power indicating hand, and a differential gear 30. The differential gear has a first input part connected with a gear rotated and driven when the power spring is wound, a second input part connected with a gear rotated and drive when the power spring is loosened, and an out part 36a connected with the indicating hand. The indicating hand can show a position of an arbitrary angle between two terminal position.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 9/00 (2006.01); G04B 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1139182 A1 20011004; EP 1139182 B1 20071003; DE 60036603 D1 20071115; DE 60036603 T2 20080703; JP 2001349962 A 20011221; JP 4508451 B2 20100721; US 2001024405 A1 20010927; US 6340241 B2 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E-PATENT S.A., CH

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140327

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036603

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60036603

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130405

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100327

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071219

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INFOSUISSE INFORMATION HORLOGERE ET INDUSTRIELLE

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036603 P 20071115

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAUCHER MANUFACTURE FLEURIER SA

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI