Global Patent Index - EP 1141266 A4

EP 1141266 A4 2002-09-25 - EXPRESSION VECTORS COMPRISING MULTIPLE SHEAR STRESS RESPONSIVE ELEMENTS (SSRE) AND A GENE OF INTEREST AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

EXPRESSION VECTORS COMPRISING MULTIPLE SHEAR STRESS RESPONSIVE ELEMENTS (SSRE) AND A GENE OF INTEREST AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

EXPRESSIONSVEKTOREN, WELCHE MULTIPLE, AUF SCHERBELASTUNG REAGIERENDE ELEMENTE (SSRE) UMFASSEN UND EIN GEN UND VERFAHREN IHRER ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

VECTEURS D'EXPRESSION COMPRENANT DES ELEMENTS MULTIPLES SENSIBLES A DES CONTRAINTES DE CISAILLEMENT (SSRE), GENE ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1141266 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99961261 A

Priority

  • IL 9900702 W
  • US 11386398 P
  • US 22051098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0039275A2] This invention provides expression vectors comprising multiple shear stress responsive elements and one or more genes of interest and methods of treating disorders related to or associated with vasculogenesis and/or angiogenesis conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; A01N 63/00; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/04; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/713 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/85 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2830/002 (2013.01); C12N 2830/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9845468 A1 19981015 - NASA [US], et al
  • [X] RESNICK N ET AL: "HEMODYNAMIC FORCES ARE COMPLEX REGULATORS OF ENDOTHELIAL GENE EXPRESSION", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, vol. 10, no. 9, 1 July 1995 (1995-07-01), pages 874 - 882, XP002075318, ISSN: 0892-6638
  • [X] KHACHIGIAN LEVON M ET AL: "Egr-1 is activated in endothelial cells exposed to fluid shear stress and interacts with a novel shear-stress-response element in the PDGF A-chain promoter.", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 17, no. 10, 1997, pages 2280 - 2286, XP002207169, ISSN: 1079-5642
  • [Y] HAMMOND T G ET AL: "EPITHELIAL CELL GENE EXPRESSION IS SHEAR STRESS RESPONSIVE", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, BETHESDA, MD, US, vol. SUPPL, no. 8, 13 December 1997 (1997-12-13), pages 433a, XP002075321, ISSN: 1059-1524
  • [Y] SUMPIO BAUER E ET AL: "Regulation of tPA in endothelial cells exposed to cyclic strain: Role of CRE, AP-2, and SSRE binding sites.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 273, no. 5 PART 1, November 1997 (1997-11-01), pages C1441 - C1448, XP002207170, ISSN: 0002-9513 & BAUER E. SUMPIO ET AL.: "Regulation of PDGF-B in Endothelial Cells exposed to cyclic strain", ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., vol. 18, no. 3, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 349 - 355, XP002207171BAUER E. SUMPIO ET AL.Regulation of PDGF-B in Endothelial Cells exposed to cyclic strainARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL.199803183349355
  • [A] MIYAHARA K ET AL: "CLONING AND STRUCTURAL CHARACTERIZATION OF THE HUMAN ENDOTHELIAL NITRIC-OXIDE-SYNTHASE GENE", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, vol. 223, no. 3, 1 August 1994 (1994-08-01), pages 719 - 726, XP000610193, ISSN: 0014-2956
  • See also references of WO 0039275A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0039275 A2 20000706; WO 0039275 A3 20001026; AU 1795400 A 20000731; EP 1141266 A2 20011010; EP 1141266 A4 20020925; JP 2002533113 A 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/00 A, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7A 01N 63/00 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 12N 15/85 B

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI