Global Patent Index - EP 1141295 A4

EP 1141295 A4 2002-09-18 - HUMAN CHEMOKINE BETA-10 MUTANT POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

HUMAN CHEMOKINE BETA-10 MUTANT POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

MUTANTEN VON MENSCHLICHEN CHEMOKIN BETA-10 POLYPEPTIDEN

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES MUTANTS DE CHIMIOKINE BETA-10 HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1141295 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00903142 A

Priority

  • US 0000296 W
  • US 11543999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0040726A1] Human chemokine Beta-10 polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such chemokine polypeptides and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such chemokine polypeptides for the treatment of leukemia, tumors, chronic infections, autoimmune disease, fibrotic disorders, wound healing and psoriasis. Antagonists against such chemokine polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to treat rheumatoid arthritis, autoimmune and chronic inflammatory and infective diseases, allergic reactions, prostaglandin-independent fever and bone marrow failure are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/17; A61K 38/19; C07K 14/52; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/03; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C12N 15/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/523 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9731098 A1 19970828 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [X] GARCIA-ZEPEDA E A ET AL: "HUMAN MONOCYTE CHEMOATTRACTANT PROTEIN (MCP)-4 IS A NOVEL CC CHEMOKINE WITH ACTIVITIES ON MONOCYTES, EOSINOPHILS, AND BASOPHILS INDUCED IN ALLERGIC AND NONALLERGIC INFLAMMATION THAT SIGNALS THROUGH THE CC CHEMOKINE RECEPTORS (CCR)-2 AND -3", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, vol. 157, no. 12, 15 December 1996 (1996-12-15), pages 5613 - 5626, XP002034960, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [X] UGUCCIONI M ET AL: "MONOCYTE CHEMOTACTIC PROTEIN 4 (MCP-4), A NOVEL STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL ANALOGUE OF MCP-3 AND EOTAXIN", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, TOKYO, JP, vol. 183, no. 5, 1 May 1996 (1996-05-01), pages 2379 - 2384, XP002035227, ISSN: 0022-1007
  • See also references of WO 0040726A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0040726 A1 20000713; AU 2493000 A 20000724; CA 2359853 A1 20000713; EP 1141295 A1 20011010; EP 1141295 A4 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060817

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI