Global Patent Index - EP 1141506 B1

EP 1141506 B1 2002-11-27 - WINDOW OR DOOR SASH

Title (en)

WINDOW OR DOOR SASH

Title (de)

FENSTER- ODER TÜRFLÜGEL

Title (fr)

BATTANT DE FENETRE OU DE PORTE

Publication

EP 1141506 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00904897 A

Priority

  • DE 19901221 A
  • DE 19941371 A
  • EP 0000154 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0045018A2] The invention relates to a window or door sash comprising a casement which is assembled from hollow profiled strips (14, 16) and comprises a channel (24) for the lock bar, which on the room side has a rabbet (18) and with its base (20), which base on the inside of the rabbet protrudes perpendicularly in relation to said rabbet, delimits a rebated area (22). The sash presents a lock bar drive (26) which on the inside of the rabbet can be introduced into an opening in the base of the lock bar channel (20) as well as a turning handle which from the outer side of the rabbet can be coupled to the lock bar drive via a central hole (28) for receiving a polygonal lug and through two fixing holes (30', 30'') embodied in the casement (10) laterally in relation to the central hole (28). The invention aims to simplify the production process as much as possible. To this end the invention provides for the holes (28, 30', 30'') in the casement (10) to be positioned at the level of the base of the lock bar channel (20) and for the opening in said base (20) to be divided by means of two transverse links arranged in the area between the holes (28, 30', 30''). Complementary thereto, the drive housing of the lock bar drive provided for in the invention has on its outer contours a recess (70, 72) which on one side is open towards the edge, is parallel to the axis of rotation of the toothed wheel (36) and protrudes into the area between the toothed wheel (36) and one of the threaded eyes (54, 56).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0045018 A2 20000803; WO 0045018 A3 20001207; AT 228606 T 20021215; AU 2663500 A 20000818; EP 1141506 A2 20011010; EP 1141506 B1 20021127; EP 1141506 B2 20070502

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228606 T

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120112

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EUGEN *NOTTER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030113

2007-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2004-08-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-10-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1141506E

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000816 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228606 T 20021215

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI