Global Patent Index - EP 1141986 B1

EP 1141986 B1 2002-09-11 - DISCONNECT SWITCH

Title (en)

DISCONNECT SWITCH

Title (de)

TRENNSCHALTER

Title (fr)

SECTIONNEUR

Publication

EP 1141986 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963274 A

Priority

  • DE 9903850 W
  • DE 19857324 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0036622A1] The invention relates to a disconnect switch for the load circuit of a battery of a motor vehicle. Said disconnect switch has a movable contact element (81, 126, 205) and a stationary contact element (64, 121, 204). The movable contact element is fixed in a locked position by a locking mechanism. A shape-memory alloy thermoelement (4, 104, 215) is used as a means for opening the locking mechanism, said element contracting itself upon being heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/32 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 37/323 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5877 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0036622 A1 20000622; EP 1141986 A1 20011010; EP 1141986 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1141986E

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902702 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE