Global Patent Index - EP 1142451 B1

EP 1142451 B1 2002-09-04 - METHOD FOR THE BINAURAL ADJUSTMENT OF HEARING AIDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE BINAURAL ADJUSTMENT OF HEARING AIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BINAURALEN ANPASSUNG VON HÖRGERÄTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ADAPTATION BIAURICULAIRE D'APPAREILS AUDITIFS

Publication

EP 1142451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99959173 A

Priority

  • EP 99959173 A
  • CH 9900631 W
  • EP 99100056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915639A1] The invention relates to a method for the binaural adjustment of transmission characteristics of a hearing aid consisting of hearing aid parts (4, 5), one of which is intended for the left ear and the other for the right air. According to the invention a data processing device (1) to which a pointing device (3) and a display unit (2) can be connected is used. The pointing device (3) is used to modify parameters of the transmission characteristics. The method provided for in the invention is characterized in that the parameters of the one hearing aid part (4; 5) can be set independently of the parameters of the other hearing aid part (5; 4) and in that the parameters of both hearing aid parts (4, 5) can be set simultaneously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 29/00; H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); H04R 25/04 (2006.01); H04R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 25/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915639 A1 19990512; AU 1646900 A 20000724; AU 763061 B2 20030710; CA 2358199 A1 20000713; CN 1332948 A 20020123; DE 59902605 D1 20021010; DK 1142451 T3 20030106; EP 1142451 A1 20011010; EP 1142451 B1 20020904; JP 2002534934 A 20021015; JP 4262895 B2 20090513; US 6449372 B1 20020910; WO 0041442 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1142451E

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902605 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010602

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI