EP 1142501 A1 20011010 - Illumination assembly for an umbrella
Title (en)
Illumination assembly for an umbrella
Title (de)
Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für einen Regenschirm
Title (fr)
Dispositif d'éclairage pour un parapluie
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 00107047 A 20000403
Abstract (en)
An illumination assembly for an umbrella has a transparent tubular member (10), a sleeve (12) detachably mounted on the tubular member (10), an LED (13) securely received in the sleeve (12) and a control unit mounted in the sleeve (12) to provide electricity to the LED (13). The tubular member (10) has a longitudinal central hole (102) and a conical division wall (104) integrally formed in the central hole (102). The LED (13) faces the conical division wall (104) of the tubular member (10). Such that, the illumination from the LED (13) can be reflected repeatedly by the conical division wall (104), and the transparent tubular member (10) can become into a lighting member with the light of the LED (13). This can improve the illumination effect to other people to increase the safety of using the umbrella. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A45B 3/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A45B 3/04 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 05 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 04 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 148 (C - 0928) 13 April 1992 (1992-04-13)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00107047 A 20000403