Global Patent Index - EP 1142706 A3

EP 1142706 A3 2001-12-19 - Direct-to-plate lithographic printing method using automatic plate-coating and -cleaning

Title (en)

Direct-to-plate lithographic printing method using automatic plate-coating and -cleaning

Title (de)

"Direct-to-plate" lithographisches Druckverfahren mit automatischer Platten-beschichtung und -reinigung

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression lithographique dite "direct-to-plate", avec revêtement et nettoyage automatique des plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 1142706 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00203968 A

Priority

  • EP 00203968 A
  • EP 00200178 A
  • EP 00200177 A
  • EP 00200176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1142706A2] A direct-to-plate method of lithographic printing is disclosed wherein a printing press is used that is coupled to a coating apparatus and to a cleaning apparatus; wherein the coating apparatus applies an image-recording layer on a substrate so as to obtain a printing plate, which is mechanically transferred to the printing press; and wherein, after the print job, the printing plate is mechanically transferred to the cleaning apparatus wherein the substrate is recycled, so that the recycled substrated can be reused in a next cycle of coating, printing and cleaning. The off-press coating and the off-press cleaning step provide a fully automated printing method wherein the press down-time is minimized. The method comprises also an off-press or an on-press exposure step. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/18 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 7/24 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/5022 (2013.01); C11D 3/18 (2013.01); C11D 11/0041 (2013.01); B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41N 3/006 (2013.01); C11D 7/24 (2013.01); C11D 7/263 (2013.01); C11D 7/3218 (2013.01); C11D 7/3263 (2013.01); C11D 7/3281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1142706 A2 20011010; EP 1142706 A3 20011219; EP 1142706 B1 20050907

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111114

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60022470

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111114

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022470 P 20051013

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VERSCHUEREN, ERIC

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOEDEWEECK, RUDI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI