Global Patent Index - EP 1142782 A3

EP 1142782 A3 2001-12-05 - Buoyant marker

Title (en)

Buoyant marker

Title (de)

Schwimmende Seezeichen

Title (fr)

Marqueur flottant

Publication

EP 1142782 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01302015 A

Priority

GB 0008635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1142782A2] A messenger buoy (10) is designed for floating in water to provide a visual message. The buoyant marker (10) includes a message portion (12) which protrudes in use from the water and which bears the message, and a stabiliser portion (14) for locating in the water, the stabiliser portion including an opening for receiving a ballast material (36). The messenger buoy may be used to display a message in an area of water such as a lake or gravel pit on in coastal areas. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 22/16; B63B 22/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 22/16 (2006.01); B63B 22/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 22/20 (2013.01); B63B 22/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1142782 A2 20011010; EP 1142782 A3 20011205; GB 0008635 D0 20000531; GB 2361457 A 20011024; GB 2361457 B 20030409

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020115

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 22/16 A, 7B 63B 22/20 B

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI