Global Patent Index - EP 1142903 A9

EP 1142903 A9 2001-12-05 - BRAIN CELL OR NERVE CELL-PROTECTIVE AGENTS COMPRISING GINSENOSIDE Rb 1?

Title (en)

BRAIN CELL OR NERVE CELL-PROTECTIVE AGENTS COMPRISING GINSENOSIDE Rb 1?

Title (de)

GEHIRN ODER NERVENZELLEN SCHÜTZENDE WIRKSTOFFE DIE GINSENOSID RB1 AUFWEISEN

Title (fr)

AGENTS PROTECTEURS DE CELLULES CEREBRALES OU NERVEUSES CONTENANT DU GINSENOSIDE Rb 1?

Publication

EP 1142903 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 99919615 A

Priority

  • JP 9902550 W
  • JP 36556098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0037481A1] Preparations for efficaciously administering ginsenoside Rb1 or its salt useful as cell-protective agents. More particularly, medicinal compositions for inhibiting apoptosis or apoptosis-like cell death or medicinal compositions for promoting the expression of a cell death inhibitory gene product Bcl-xL which contain ginsenoside Rb1 or its salt; and preparations for intravenous administration which contain ginsenoside Rb1 or its salt. The above medicinal compositions contain ginsenoside Rb1 or its salt at a low concentration, preferably 1 ng/ml or less and still preferably 1 to 100 fg/ml. These compositions have effects of promoting the expression of the cell death inhibitory gene product Bcl-xL and inhibiting apoptosis or apoptosis-like cell death. The above preparations for intravenous administration are useful in treating or preventing, in particular, brain and nervous diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07J 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07J 13/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7028 (2006.01); A61K 31/7034 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 31/715 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07J 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/704 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0037481 A1 20000629; CN 1331698 A 20020116; EP 1142903 A1 20011010; EP 1142903 A4 20020417; EP 1142903 A9 20011205; JP 2000191539 A 20000711; TW I248361 B 20060201; US 2002002141 A1 20020103; US 6579853 B2 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080424

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-04-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07J 17/00 A, 7A 61K 31/58 B

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BRAIN CELL OR NERVE CELL-PROTECTIVE AGENTS COMPRISING GINSENOSIDE RB 1

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI