Global Patent Index - EP 1142976 B8

EP 1142976 B8 2007-10-10 - Vacuum ultraviolet ray-excited light-emitting phosphor

Title (en)

Vacuum ultraviolet ray-excited light-emitting phosphor

Title (de)

Mit Vakuum-UV-Licht anregbarer Licht emittierender Leuchtstoff

Title (fr)

Materiau fluorescent excitable par les ultraviolets à vide et émettant de la lumiere

Publication

EP 1142976 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01108526 A

Priority

JP 2000104438 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1142976A2] A vacuum ultraviolet ray-excited light-emitting phosphor comprising a compound represented by formula (BaxM1-x)1-0.25yMg1-yAl10+yO17+0.25y as a substrate, and Eu as an activator, wherein M represents Ca, Sr, or Ca and Sr, x and y satisfy the following relations, 0.5</=x</=1, and 0.05</=y</=0.15.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/64 (2006.01); C09K 11/79 (2006.01); C09K 11/77 (2006.01); C09K 11/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7734 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1142976 A2 20011010; EP 1142976 A3 20030723; EP 1142976 B1 20070711; EP 1142976 B8 20071010; CN 1206312 C 20050615; CN 1317538 A 20011017; DE 60129268 D1 20070823; DE 60129268 T2 20080320; KR 100742552 B1 20070725; KR 20010095315 A 20011103; TW I285217 B 20070811; US 2002000538 A1 20020103; US 6576157 B2 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080404

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129268 P 20070823

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C09K 11/64 20060101AFI20060421BHEP

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI