Global Patent Index - EP 1143104 A1

EP 1143104 A1 2001-10-10 - A composite tube with embedded power conductors

Title (en)

A composite tube with embedded power conductors

Title (de)

Verbundrohr mit eingebetteten Leitern

Title (fr)

Tuyau composite avec conducteurs électriques incorporés

Publication

EP 1143104 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201215 A

Priority

EP 00201215 A

Abstract (en)

A spoolable tube (1) for use inserted in or connected to a bore hole in the ground has a tube wall (2) having at least one axially extending circumferential layer of composite material (3) and at least one longitudinally extending electric power conductor (4) embedded in the tube wall (2) and formed by a flexible, strip-like element (4) including a plurality of electrically conductive filaments (6). By configuring the conductor as a strip-like element, the cross-sectional area of the element in the tube wall (2) can be relatively large. The plurality of conducting filaments (6) provide the conductor with a structure capable of accommodating to relatively large temporary deformations of surrounding material which occur during spooling of the tube (1) to a relatively small radius. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7

E21B 17/20

IPC 8 full level

E21B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC

E21B 17/206 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 5921285 A 19990713 - QUIGLEY PETER A [US], et al
  • WO 9919653 A1 19990422 - FIBERSPAR SPOOLABLE PROD INC [US]
  • BULLOCK,DANIEL E. AND BOYCE,JOSEPH: "On-line consolidation of thermoplastic matrix composite using ultrasonic heating", 39TH INTERNATIONALSAMPLE SYMPOSIUM, 11 April 1994 (1994-04-11) - 14 April 1994 (1994-04-14), pages 1500 - 1506
  • KEN NEWMAN: "coiled tubing technology continues its rapid growth", WORLD OIL (JANUARY 1998), pages 64 - 71

Citation (search report)

DCS

DE

DOCDB simple family

EP 1143104 A1 20011010; AU 4695001 A 20011015; WO 0175263 A1 20011011