Global Patent Index - EP 1143118 A3

EP 1143118 A3 2002-11-13 - Device for varying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head

Title (en)

Device for varying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Hubverstellung eines Gaswechselventils im Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour varier la levée d'une soupape dans la culasse d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1143118 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01106205 A

Priority

DE 10017441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1143118A2] The device (1) has a transmission element (4) co-operating with the gas shuttle valve (2) and contacting a control track (6) of a pivot lever (7) that has an empty stroke curve (6') and a stroke curve (6''). The other lever end (8) contacts a cam disc (9) on a control shaft (10) that is controlled to rotate or be fixed in a cylinder head (3). A camshaft in the cylinder head parallel to the control shaft acts over a cam on a curve track at the pivot lever to operate the gas shuttle valve. The pivot lever is guided on one side during a cam-controlled pivot movement against a readjusting spring (13) over the lever end contacting the cam disc. The pivot lever is further guided on the other side over the control shaft with support surfaces (14) at shaft sections (15) of the control shaft on both sides of the cam disc to move slidingly and co-operate with a pivot lever slideway (16). The support faces of the shaft section of the control shaft are spherical.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0021 (2013.01); F01L 13/0063 (2013.01); F01L 2013/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1143118 A2 20011010; EP 1143118 A3 20021113; EP 1143118 B1 20030813; DE 10017441 A1 20011011; ES 2204773 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204773 T3

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100476 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI