Global Patent Index - EP 1143135 A3

EP 1143135 A3 2002-11-27 - Cooling water channel structure of a cylinder head and method of manufacturing a cylinder head

Title (en)

Cooling water channel structure of a cylinder head and method of manufacturing a cylinder head

Title (de)

Zylinderkopfkühlwasserstruktur und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Structure des conduits de refroidissement pour une culasse et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1143135 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01107296 A

Priority

JP 2000105248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1143135A2] A cooling water channel of a cylinder head (1) has two parallel channels: an intake side channel (2) extending along the periphery of an intake port (5) in a longitudinal direction and an exhaust side channel (3) extending along the periphery of an exhaust port (6) in a longitudinal direction. Furthermore, a central channel (4) defined between the intake port (5) and the exhaust port (6) is divided into upper and lower sides, and the central channel (4a) on the upper side is communicated with the exhaust side channel (3), and the central channel (4b) on the lower side is communicated with the intake side channel (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/42; F02F 1/40; F01P 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/36 (2006.01); B22C 9/24 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01); F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4285 (2013.01); F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] FR 2774128 A1 19990730 - RENAULT [FR]
  • [A] US 1845521 A 19320216 - ROSS CARL A
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 12 25 December 1997 (1997-12-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 385 (M - 548) 24 December 1986 (1986-12-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1143135 A2 20011010; EP 1143135 A3 20021127; EP 1143135 B1 20071121; DE 60131487 D1 20080103; DE 60131487 T2 20080925; JP 2001289116 A 20011019; JP 4250723 B2 20090408

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150323

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140307

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131487 P 20080103

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050908

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 1/42 A, 7F 02F 1/40 B, 7F 01P 3/14 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI