Global Patent Index - EP 1143143 A3

EP 1143143 A3 2002-11-13 - Compressor piston and process for producing the compressor piston

Title (en)

Compressor piston and process for producing the compressor piston

Title (de)

Verdichterkolben und sein Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Piston de compresseur et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1143143 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01108328 A

Priority

  • JP 2000101020 A
  • JP 2000101026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1143143A2] A hollow piston has an end wall that receives pressure in a cylinder bore of a compressor. A reinforcing protrusion is formed on the inner end face of the end wall. The contour of the protrusion, from the radially outside portion toward the radially inside portion, first approaches the outer end face and then departs from the outer end face. Therefore, the piston is light and strong. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08; F04B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0878 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1143143 A2 20011010; EP 1143143 A3 20021113; BR 0101291 A 20011106; CN 1316595 A 20011010; KR 100472277 B1 20050307; KR 20010095238 A 20011103; US 2001047720 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050304

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI