EP 1143561 A1 20011010 - Electromagnetic wave reflector and associated manufactoring method
Title (en)
Electromagnetic wave reflector and associated manufactoring method
Title (de)
Reflektor elektromagnetischer Wellen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung
Title (fr)
Réflecteur d'ondes électromagnétiques et son procédé de fabrication
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 99947544 A 19991012
- FR 9813007 A 19981016
Abstract (en)
The embedded wires are arranged parallel or in the form of a grid, and are embedded in thermoplastic material. The structure acts as the reflector for a microwave antenna and focuses received signals onto a feed element. The aerial is constructed from electrically conducting wires (1) situated at a distance from each other, and embedded in the surface of a sheet of thermoplastic material. The wires may be parallel, or may form a grid, and the sheet of material forming the aerial may be concave. The wires lie nearer to one surface of the plastic than the other and have a separation between 0.003 mm and 1.5 cm, whilst the diameter of the wires lies in the range 0.005 - 5mm. The thickness of the plastic is between 0.5 mm and 1 cm and may be coloured or transparent.
Abstract (fr)
Dans cette antenne en un élément en un matériau conducteur de l'électricité, l'élément comprend une toile (1) enrobée au moins en partie d'une nappe (2) de matière thermoplastique. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B29C 45/14 (2006.01); H01Q 15/14 (2006.01); H01Q 15/16 (2006.01); H01Q 15/22 (2006.01); B29L 31/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H01Q 15/141 (2013.01 - EP US); H01Q 15/142 (2013.01 - EP US); H01Q 15/22 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4030953 A 19770621 - RUTSCHOW JOSEPH FREDRICK, et al
- [A] FR 2244618 A1 19750418 - ASEA AB [SE]
- [A] DE 9001255 U1 19900405
- [DA] EP 0595418 A1 19940504 - W S PLASTIC S R L DI [IT]
- [A] US 5473111 A 19951205 - HATTORI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 414 (M - 1171) 22 October 1991 (1991-10-22)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 548 (E - 856) 7 December 1989 (1989-12-07)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 217 (M - 1252) 21 May 1992 (1992-05-21)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 6486854 B1 20021126; AT E286309 T1 20050115; AU 6095299 A 20000508; BR 9912233 A 20010410; CA 2337810 A1 20000427; DE 69923001 D1 20050203; DE 69923001 T2 20050721; EP 1119884 A1 20010801; EP 1143561 A1 20011010; EP 1143561 B1 20041229; FR 2784804 A1 20000421; FR 2784804 B1 20010629; JP 2002528937 A 20020903; WO 0024086 A1 20000427
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 80608301 A 20010322; AT 01201226 T 19991012; AU 6095299 A 19991012; BR 9912233 A 19991012; CA 2337810 A 19991012; DE 69923001 T 19991012; EP 01201226 A 19991012; EP 99947544 A 19991012; FR 9813007 A 19981016; FR 9902450 W 19991012; JP 2000577736 A 19991012