Global Patent Index - EP 1143585 A3

EP 1143585 A3 2002-11-06 - Surge arrester device

Title (en)

Surge arrester device

Title (de)

Überspannungsschutzelement

Title (fr)

Dispositif limiteur de surtensions

Publication

EP 1143585 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01116334 A

Priority

  • DE 19818674 A
  • EP 99107875 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0954073A1] The excess voltage protection unit, to lead off transient excess voltages, has electrodes (3,4) with current connections (1,2). An air break spark stretch (5) is between the electrodes (3,4). The stretch (5) extinguishes mains current surges following the pickup voltage of lightning current, as the electrodes (3,4) are in parallel. The structure is contained within a housing (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/00 (2006.01); H01T 4/02 (2006.01); H01T 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818674 A1 19991028; DE 19818674 B4 20040429; AT 220252 T 20020715; AT 266903 T 20040515; CN 1241054 A 20000112; CN 1257586 C 20060524; EP 0954073 A1 19991103; EP 0954073 B1 20020703; EP 1143585 A2 20011010; EP 1143585 A3 20021106; EP 1143585 B1 20040512; EP 1143585 B2 20081105; ES 2180239 T3 20030201; ES 2217060 T3 20041101; ES 2217060 T5 20090416; US 2002024789 A1 20020228; US 6392862 B1 20020521; US 6529360 B2 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180704

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150422

2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140421

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 266903 T

- Effective date: 20140421

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-03-25 [REG DE R124] RE-ESTABLISHMENT DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59909490

2014-02-18 [REG DE R124] RE-ESTABLISHMENT DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59909490

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-11 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Document: DE 59909490

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-02-03 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2008-11-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-11-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20081105

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2005-05-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DEHN + SOEHNE GMBH + CO.KG

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-04-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEHN + SOEHNE GMBH + CO.KG

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217060 T3

2004-07-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909490 P 20040617

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0954073 P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRACHT, GERD, DIPL.-ING.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEHMANN, EBERHARD, DIPL-ING.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHEIBE, KLAUS, PROF. DR.-ING.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHIMANSKI, JOACHIM, DIPL.ING.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WETTER, MARTIN, DR.-ING.

2001-10-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 954073

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE