Global Patent Index - EP 1144059 A3

EP 1144059 A3 2002-09-04 - VIDEO TRAINING AND GAMING METHOD FOR COMPARING EVENTS

Title (en)

VIDEO TRAINING AND GAMING METHOD FOR COMPARING EVENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN UND SPIELVERFAHREN ZUM VERGLEICH VON EREIGNISSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE JEUX ET PARIS ET D'ENTRAINEMENT VIDEO POUR LA COMPARAISON D'EVENEMENTS

Publication

EP 1144059 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00962759 A

Priority

  • IB 0001422 W
  • US 15862399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0126760A2] A computerized training and gaming method includes the steps of (1) registering a player, the current player, through the use of an authentication routine; (2) retrieving current player information from a database on a server-side secure database; (3) providing the opportunity for the player to select an event type and event contestants, and awaiting his input; (4) when the player chooses an event type and at least one contestant, presenting the player with a video clip of the selected contestant(s); (5) after the playing of the events, soliciting the player's estimation of who won the event or, based upon predefined (absolute, subjective, qualitative or quantitative) criteria; (6) evaluating the player's response and reporting to the player as to whether he was correct; (7) reporting the results to the player, including, optionally, evaluating any related criteria, such as the player's losses or gains, based upon the correctness of the player's estimation and reporting the same to the player and showing the events using video superimposition technology.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3295 (2013.01); A63F 2300/407 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0126760 A2 20010419; WO 0126760 A8 20011101; AU 7439900 A 20010423; EP 1144059 A2 20011017; EP 1144059 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040501

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DARTFISH SA

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.