Global Patent Index - EP 1144137 A3

EP 1144137 A3 2002-11-20 - SIEVING DEVICE FOR SOLID MATERIAL AND A METHOD FOR SIEVING SOLID MATERIAL

Title (en)

SIEVING DEVICE FOR SOLID MATERIAL AND A METHOD FOR SIEVING SOLID MATERIAL

Title (de)

SIEBVORRICHTUNG FÜR FESTSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUM SIEBEN VON FESTSTOFF

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DE MATIERE SOLIDE

Publication

EP 1144137 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99936263 A

Priority

  • DE 9901482 W
  • DE 19823018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823018A1] The screening device uses a rod (8) which is wound into a spiral (10). It is rotated is fed into the interior of the spiral, e.g. via a rotary feed drum (2) with the spiral attached to it at one end. The rotary feed drum may be inclined to the horizontal, with the spiral attached to its lower end. The axis of the spiral may be curved downwards due to the spiral weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/027 (2006.01); B07B 1/18 (2006.01); B07B 1/22 (2006.01); B07B 1/46 (2006.01); C10B 1/10 (2006.01); C10B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/18 (2013.01); C10B 1/10 (2013.01); C10B 53/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823018 A1 19991125; AT 260715 T 20040315; AT 271930 T 20040815; CA 2333051 A1 19991202; CN 1168545 C 20040929; CN 1268447 C 20060809; CN 1311719 A 20010905; CN 1530182 A 20040922; CZ 20004228 A3 20010815; DE 59908780 D1 20040408; DE 59910086 D1 20040902; DK 1144137 T3 20040614; DK 1348492 T3 20041206; EP 1144137 A2 20011017; EP 1144137 A3 20021120; EP 1144137 B1 20040303; EP 1348492 A1 20031001; EP 1348492 B1 20040728; ES 2219039 T3 20041116; ES 2225810 T3 20050316; HU 0204465 A2 20030428; JP 2003520116 A 20030702; MY 129544 A 20070430; PL 353029 A1 20031006; PT 1144137 E 20040730; PT 1348492 E 20041231; SK 17402000 A3 20011008; TW 515345 U 20021221; US 6786335 B1 20040907; WO 9961172 A2 19991202; WO 9961172 A3 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080517

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060518

2007-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061117

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061117

2006-10-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TAKUMA CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.

- Free text: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.#64, TSUKIJI 5-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 104-8439 (JP) $ TAKUMA CO., LTD.#1-3-23 DOJIMAHAMA , KITA -KU#OSAKA 530-004 (JP)

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060517

2005-08-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219039 T3

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908780 P 20040408

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERDINIG, HELMUT

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VON RHEIN, WINFRIED

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIGGENMANN, REINHOLD

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROPPER, GEORG

2004-03-03 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 07B 1/18 A

2003-08-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SIEVING DEVICE FOR SOLID MATERIAL AND A METHOD FOR SIEVING SOLID MATERIAL

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.