Global Patent Index - EP 1144157 A3

EP 1144157 A3 2003-06-18 - METHOD TO IMPROVE THE SURFACE TOPOGRAPHY OF ROLLER BEARING COMPONENTS

Title (en)

METHOD TO IMPROVE THE SURFACE TOPOGRAPHY OF ROLLER BEARING COMPONENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERN DER TOPOGRAPHIE DER BAUELEMENTE VON ROLLENLAGERFÜHRUNGEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES PALIERS A ELEMENTS ROULANTS

Publication

EP 1144157 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00940514 A

Priority

  • GB 0002266 W
  • GB 9913658 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0076722A2] A method of treatment of a rolling element bearing component by hard particle abrasion to improve the surface topography of the component. The hard particle abrasion includes the steps of immersing the bearing component in a receptacle containing hard particles, preferably alumina, and agitating the component and/or hard particles to produce relative movement. Preferably the method is performed for between 10 minutes and 1 hour. The relative movement may be produced by rotating the component in one direction while the receptacle is rotated in the opposite direction. The surface finish of the component is preferably improved from around 0.13 mu m to around 0.07 mu m. Compressive stress in the surface of the component may also be improved, typically by between 200 MPa and 500 MPa. Rolling contact fatigue life of the component is also improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 31/00 (2006.01); B24B 1/00 (2006.01); B24B 31/02 (2006.01); F16C 33/32 (2006.01); F16C 33/34 (2006.01); F16C 33/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 1/00 (2013.01); B24B 31/0224 (2013.01); F16C 2240/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0076722 A2 20001221; WO 0076722 A3 20030424; WO 0076722 B1 20030522; AU 5544000 A 20010102; CA 2339981 A1 20001221; CN 1127393 C 20031112; CN 1315897 A 20011003; EP 1144157 A2 20011017; EP 1144157 A3 20030618; GB 0014326 D0 20000802; GB 2353239 A 20010221; GB 2353239 B 20031210; GB 9913658 D0 19990811; JP 2003525753 A 20030902; JP 4803694 B2 20111026

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050419

2004-07-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.