Global Patent Index - EP 1144261 B1

EP 1144261 B1 2003-06-18 - BEVERAGE CARTON WITH STRAP TYPE CARRYING HANDLE

Title (en)

BEVERAGE CARTON WITH STRAP TYPE CARRYING HANDLE

Title (de)

GETRÄNKEKARTON MIT BANDARTIGEM TRAGEGRIFF

Title (fr)

CARTON A BOISSONS DISPOSANT D'UNE POIGNEE DE TRANSPORT EN FORME DE BANDE

Publication

EP 1144261 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99945335 A

Priority

  • GB 9825122 A
  • US 9919883 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0038998A2] A carton and blank (10) for forming a carton for beverage containers which carton includes a series of hinged panels (12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22) forming a sleeve and end closure panels (34, 36, 38, 40) hinged to at least one associated hinged panel (12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22) for closing, at least in part, the opposite ends of a sleeve. The said carton includes handle means by which the carton can be carried, said handle means comprising a strap (38) connected to opposed end panels (38, 40) having a user part (74) which is in substantially co-planar relationship with said one hinged panel (18) when in a stored condition. The strap (98) is so connected at its opposite ends to said end closure panels (38, 40) as to provide a surplus of material to enable said user part to be brought into a position of use.

[origin: WO0038998A2] A carton and blank for forming a carton for beverage containers which carton includes a series of hinged panels forming a sleeve and end closure panels hinged to at least one associated hinged panel for closing, at least in part, the opposite ends of a sleeve. The said carton includes handle means by which the carton can be carried, said handle means comprising a strap connected to opposed end panels having a user part which is in substantially co-planar relationship with said one hinged panel when in a stored condition. The strap is so connected at its opposite ends to said end closure panels as to provide a surplus of material to enable said user part to be brought into a position of use. The invention further comprises a carton for holding a plurality of articles in a group, which carton comprising top, opposed side walls and a base, hingedly interconnected together to form a tubular structure wherein at least one said side wall comprises a displaceable zone arranged to protrude out of a plane of the side wall to accommodate a portion of an adjacent article. The displaceable zone comprises a multiplicity of connected sections each occupying a different plane to a next adjacent section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/46 (2006.01); B65D 5/475 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/36 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00493 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00543 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00728 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0038998 A2 20000706; WO 0038998 A3 20020214; WO 0038998 A9 20020822; AT 243138 T 20030715; AU 5795199 A 20000731; BR 9913296 A 20010925; CA 2342348 A1 20000706; CN 1234579 C 20060104; CN 1342128 A 20020327; CZ 20010695 A3 20020417; DE 69908979 D1 20030724; DE 69908979 T2 20040519; DK 1144261 T3 20030929; EP 1144261 A2 20011017; EP 1144261 A3 20020911; EP 1144261 B1 20030618; ES 2209501 T3 20040616; HK 1040684 A1 20031107; HU 0202147 A2 20021028; HU 0202147 A3 20041028; HU 225808 B1 20071029; JP 2003524556 A 20030819; JP 4331411 B2 20090916; PL 194912 B1 20070731; PL 351473 A1 20030422; PT 1144261 E 20030930; SK 2772001 A3 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908979

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908979

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908979

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908979

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908979

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100830

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090830

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-03-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070830

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-06-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-09-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209501 T3

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-10-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-08-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030830

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908979 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010328;LV PAYMENT 20010328;RO PAYMENT 20010328;SI PAYMENT 20010328

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010328;LV PAYMENT 20010328;RO PAYMENT 20010328;SI PAYMENT 20010328

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.