Global Patent Index - EP 1144339 B1

EP 1144339 B1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE ELEMENT FROM A CERAMIC INNER PART AND A METAL JACKET

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COMPOSITE ELEMENT FROM A CERAMIC INNER PART AND A METAL JACKET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDELEMENTS AUS EINEM KERAMISCHEN INNENTEIL UND EINEM BLECHMANTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN ELEMENT COMPOSITE CONSTITUE D'UNE PARTIE INTERIEURE CERAMIQUE ET D'UN REVETEMENT METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1144339 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963531 A

Priority

  • DE 19857639 A
  • EP 9909922 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857639C1] According to known methods for producing a composite element from a truncated cone-shaped, fire-proof ceramic insert which is enclosed by a metal jacket, the outer jacket is heated separately and shrunk on the cold ceramic insert. Alternatively, after inductive heating of the outer jacket the ceramic insert, which is heated at the same time, is positioned in the metal jacket using a mechanical device. The invention aims to provide a new method which avoids the disadvantages associated with shrinking a separately heated hot metal jacket on to a colder ceramic insert and to provide a simple method which without inductive heating of the metal jacket and the use of mechanical devices for joining said jacket to the ceramic insert achieves an even bond between the metal jacket and ceramic insert. To this end the fire-proof insert is first introduced into the metal jacket and the conical metal jacket, which rests on a support such that its opening having the smaller diameter points downwards, is then heated from the outside. During heating the ceramic insert and metal jacket remain in constant contact. After they have been heated to a sufficiently high temperature the ceramic insert slides down by force of gravity in such a way that it expands the metal jacket and moves into the bonded position. The above composite elements are used in gas stirring systems during the production of pig iron and steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); C21C 5/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/005 (2013.01); C21C 5/48 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49865 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53439 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857639 C1 19991007; AT 224859 T 20021015; CZ 20012109 A3 20020417; CZ 296789 B6 20060614; EP 1144339 A2 20011017; EP 1144339 A3 20020306; EP 1144339 B1 20020925; PL 195120 B1 20070831; PL 352319 A1 20030811; US 6519829 B1 20030218; WO 0035831 A2 20000622; WO 0035831 A3 20011129

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902893

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101214

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902893 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224859 T 20021015

2002-09-25 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 04B 37/02 A

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.