Global Patent Index - EP 1144347 A3

EP 1144347 A3 2002-11-20 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR SEPARATING AND PURIFYING DIPHENOLS IN THE PHENOL AND PHENOL DERIVATIVES INDUSTRY

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR SEPARATING AND PURIFYING DIPHENOLS IN THE PHENOL AND PHENOL DERIVATIVES INDUSTRY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG UND REINIGUNG VON DIPHENOLEN IN DER INDUSTRIE DES PHENOLS UND VON SEINEN DERIVATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE SEPARATION ET PURIFICATION DES DIPHENOLS DANS L'INDUSTRIE DU PHENOL ET DE SES DERIVES

Publication

EP 1144347 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00900662 A

Priority

  • FR 0000166 W
  • FR 9900908 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2788763A1] Separation and purification of a crude mixture containing hydroquinone, resorcinol and possibly tars and/or catechol comprises a possible distillation stage (I) to obtain a catechol head, the foot (I) or crude mixture undergoes distillation (II) to obtain a fraction rich in resorcinol, the foot of (II) undergoes distillation (III) to obtain a fraction rich in hydroquinone, and the rich fractions are refined. Separation and purification of hydroquinone and resorcinol from a crude mixture, optionally also containing tars and catechol, by a series of distillation stages comprising: (i) optionally, a distillation (I) to produce catechol at the column head; (ii) the base effluent from (i), or if excluded, the crude mixture, is submitted to a distillation (II) to obtain, at the head, a resorcinol-rich fraction, containing mainly resorcinol and some hydroquinone; (iii) the base effluent from (ii) is submitted to a distillation (III) and a hydroquinone-rich fraction is obtained at the head, comprising mainly hydroquinone and some resorcinol; and (iv) the head fractions obtained are then submitted to refining stages (IV,V) to extract hydroquinone and resorcinol. An Independent claim is also included for the installation required to carry out the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 37/78 (2006.01); C07C 37/68 (2006.01); C07C 37/74 (2006.01); C07C 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 37/74 (2013.01); C07C 37/685 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 37/74 + C07C 39/08
  2. C07C 37/685 + C07C 39/08

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2788763 A1 20000728; FR 2788763 B1 20010413; AU 3060000 A 20000807; CN 1249002 C 20060405; CN 1450986 A 20031022; EP 1144347 A2 20011017; EP 1144347 A3 20021120; JP 2003512295 A 20030402; NO 20013619 A 20010925; NO 20013619 D0 20010723; NO 329476 B1 20101025; US 6844472 B1 20050118; WO 0043334 A2 20000727; WO 0043334 A3 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130801

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07C 39/08 A

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.