Global Patent Index - EP 1144397 A3

EP 1144397 A3 2002-09-11 - HETEROCYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE-CONTAINING THIOUREA INHIBITORS OF HERPES VIRUSES CONTAINING PHENYLENEDIAMINE GROUP

Title (en)

HETEROCYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE-CONTAINING THIOUREA INHIBITORS OF HERPES VIRUSES CONTAINING PHENYLENEDIAMINE GROUP

Title (de)

HERPESVIREN-HEMMENDE, HETEROCYCLISCHES-CARBONSÄUREAMID ENTHALTENDE THIOHARNSTOFFE MIT EINER PHENYLENDIAMINGRUPPE

Title (fr)

THIO-UREES A CARBOXAMIDE HETEROCYCLIQUE INHIBITRICES DES VIRUS DE L'HERPES ET CONTENANT UN GROUPE PHENYLENEDIAMINE

Publication

EP 1144397 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99963023 A

Priority

  • US 9928842 W
  • US 20855998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0034258A2] Compounds having formula (I) wherein R1-R5 are independently selected from hydrogen, alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkenyl of 2 to 6 carbon atoms, alkynyl of 2 to 6 carbon atoms, perhaloalkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, cycloalkyl of 3 to 10 carbon atoms, heterocycloalkyl of 3 to 10 carbon members, aryl, heteroaryl, halogen, CN, NO2, CO2R6, COR6, OR6, SR6, SOR6, SO2R6, CONR7R8, NR6N(R7R8), N(R7R8) or W-Y-(CH2)n-Z provided that at least one of R1-R5 is not hydrogen; or R2 and R3 or R3 and R4, taken together form a 3 to 7 membered heterocycloalkyl or 3 to 7 membered heteroaryl; R6 and R7 are independently hydrogen, alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, perhaloalkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, or aryl; R8 is hydrogen, alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, perhaloalkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, cycloalkyl of 3 to 10 carbon atoms, heterocycloalkyl of 3 to 10 members, aryl or heteroaryl, or R7 and R8, taken together may form a 3 to 7 membered heterocycloalkyl; W is O, NR6, or is absent; Y is (CO)- or (CO2)-, or is absent; Z is alkyl of 1 to 4 carbon atoms, CN, CO2R6, COR6, CONR7R8, OCOR6, NR6COR7, OCONR6, OR6, SR6, SOR6, SO2R6, SR6N(R7R8), N(R7R8) or phenyl; G is monocyclic heteroaryl; X is a bond, NH, alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkenyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkoxy of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, or thioalkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkylamino of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, or (CH)J; J is alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, cycloalkyl of 3 to 7 carbon atoms, phenyl or benzyl; and n is an integer from 1 to 6, useful in the treatment of diseases associated with herpes viruses including human cytomegalovirus, herpes simplex viruses, Epstein-Barr virus, varicella-zoster virus, human herpesviruses -6 and -7, and Kaposi herpesvirus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 285/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/421 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/433 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 31/22 (2006.01); C07D 233/90 (2006.01); C07D 263/34 (2006.01); C07D 277/20 (2006.01); C07D 277/56 (2006.01); C07D 285/06 (2006.01); C07D 307/68 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/34 (2013.01); C07D 233/90 (2013.01); C07D 277/56 (2013.01); C07D 285/06 (2013.01); C07D 307/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0034258 A2 20000615; WO 0034258 A3 20011129; AU 1934700 A 20000626; BG 105581 A 20011231; BR 9916046 A 20011002; CA 2350767 A1 20000615; CN 1348446 A 20020508; CZ 20011956 A3 20011017; EA 200100631 A1 20020228; EP 1144397 A2 20011017; EP 1144397 A3 20020911; HU 0200232 A2 20020529; ID 30158 A 20011108; IL 143182 D0 20020421; JP 2002531554 A 20020924; NO 20012832 A 20010807; NO 20012832 D0 20010608; PL 349217 A1 20020701; SK 7682001 A3 20020702; TR 200101664 T2 20020321; ZA 200104377 B 20021220

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037369

2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010606;LT PAYMENT 20010606;LV PAYMENT 20010606;RO PAYMENT 20010606;SI PAYMENT 20010606

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLOOM, JONATHAN DAVID

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CURRAN, KEVIN JOSEPH

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIGRANDI, MARTIN, JOSEPH

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUSHIN, RUSSELL, GEORGE

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JONES, THOMAS, RICHARD

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANG, STANLEY, ALBERT

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSS, ADMA, ANTONIA

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TEREFENKO, EUGENE, ANTHONY

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010606;LT PAYMENT 20010606;LV PAYMENT 20010606;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010606;SI PAYMENT 20010606

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.