Global Patent Index - EP 1144399 A3

EP 1144399 A3 2002-09-11 - HETEROCYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE-CONTAINING THIOUREA INHIBITORS OF HERPES VIRUSES CONTAINING A SUBSTITUTED PHENYLENEDIAMINE GROUP

Title (en)

HETEROCYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE-CONTAINING THIOUREA INHIBITORS OF HERPES VIRUSES CONTAINING A SUBSTITUTED PHENYLENEDIAMINE GROUP

Title (de)

HERPESVIREN-HEMMENDE, HETEROCYCLISCHES-CARBONSÄUREAMID ENTHALTENDE THIOHARNSTOFFE MIT EINER SUBSTITUIERTEN PHENYLENDIAMINGRUPPE

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS HETEROCYCLIQUES DE THIO-UREE DES VIRUS DE L'HERPES CONTENANT DU CARBOXAMIDE ET UN GROUPE PHENYLENEDIAMINE SUBSTITUE

Publication

EP 1144399 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99967213 A

Priority

  • US 9928916 W
  • US 20816498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0034261A2] Compounds of formula (I) wherein R1-R5 are independently selected from hydrogen, or substituents R9-R12 are independently hydrogen, or substituents provided that at least one of R9-12 is not hydrogen; G is a monocyclic heteroaryl: X is a bond, -NH, alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkenyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkoxy of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, or thioalkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, alkylamino of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, or (CH)J; J is alkyl of 1 to 6 carbon atoms, cycloalkyl of 3 to 7 carbon atoms, phenyl or benzyl, useful in the treatment of diseases associated with herpes viruses including human cytomegalovirus, herpes simplex viruses, Epstein-Barr virus, varicella-zoster virus, human herpesviruses-6 and -7, and Kaposi herpesvirus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 307/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/421 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/433 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07C 335/20 (2006.01); C07C 335/22 (2006.01); C07D 233/90 (2006.01); C07D 263/34 (2006.01); C07D 277/56 (2006.01); C07D 285/06 (2006.01); C07D 307/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/34 (2013.01); C07D 233/90 (2013.01); C07D 277/56 (2013.01); C07D 285/06 (2013.01); C07D 307/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0034261 A2 20000615; WO 0034261 A3 20020131; AU 2353900 A 20000626; BR 9916043 A 20011204; CA 2351690 A1 20000615; CN 1367785 A 20020904; CZ 20012063 A3 20011017; EA 200100639 A1 20020627; EP 1144399 A2 20011017; EP 1144399 A3 20020911; HU 0203405 A2 20030228; IL 143263 D0 20020421; JP 2002533301 A 20021008; NO 20012835 A 20010719; NO 20012835 D0 20010608; ZA 200104322 B 20021025

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037370

2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010509;LT PAYMENT 20010509;LV PAYMENT 20010509;RO PAYMENT 20010509;SI PAYMENT 20010509

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010509;LT PAYMENT 20010509;LV PAYMENT 20010509;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010509;SI PAYMENT 20010509

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.