Global Patent Index - EP 1144440 A3

EP 1144440 A3 2001-12-19 - NEUROTRANSMITTER TRANSPORTER

Title (en)

NEUROTRANSMITTER TRANSPORTER

Title (de)

TRÄGERPROTEIN FÜR NEUROTRANSMITTER

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX COMPOSES

Publication

EP 1144440 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00962668 A

Priority

  • GB 0003541 W
  • GB 9921833 A
  • GB 0006545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0119854A2] NTT7 polypeptides and polynucleotides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing NTT7 polypeptides and polynucleotides in diagnostic assays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/02; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0119854 A2 20010322; WO 0119854 A3 20010802; EP 1144440 A2 20011017; EP 1144440 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-03-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 07K 14/705 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12P 21/02 B, 7C 07K 16/28 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.