Global Patent Index - EP 1144508 A3

EP 1144508 A3 2002-09-11 - FLAMEPROOF EXTRUDATES AND FLAMEPROOF MOULDED BODIES PRODUCED BY MEANS OF PRESSING METHODS

Title (en)

FLAMEPROOF EXTRUDATES AND FLAMEPROOF MOULDED BODIES PRODUCED BY MEANS OF PRESSING METHODS

Title (de)

FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE EXTRUDATE UND MITTELS PRESSVERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE FORMKÖRPER

Title (fr)

EXTRUDATS IGNIFUGES ET CORPS MOULES IGNIFUGES PRODUITS PAR UN PROCEDE DE PRESSAGE

Publication

EP 1144508 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99964521 A

Priority

  • DE 19857965 A
  • EP 9909494 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857965A1] The invention relates to flameproof extrudates, especially films, sheets and cable sheaths, with a polyalkylene terephthalate and pentabrombenzyl polyacrylate (PBBPA) base. The inventive extrudates have an improved breaking stress and elongation at break, improved electrical properties and an improved surface finish.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 67/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08L 67/02 (2006.01); C08L 69/00 (2006.01); C08L 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 67/02 (2013.01); C08L 33/16 (2013.01); C08L 69/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 67/02 + C08L 33/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857965 A1 20000621; AU 3035500 A 20000703; BR 9916193 A 20010904; CA 2355274 A1 20000622; CN 1357027 A 20020703; EP 1144508 A2 20011017; EP 1144508 A3 20020911; ID 28970 A 20010719; IL 143222 D0 20020421; JP 2003500489 A 20030107; KR 20010101238 A 20011114; WO 0036013 A2 20000622; WO 0036013 A3 20020523

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08L 67/02 A, 7C 08K 3/22 B, 7C 08K 5/00 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.