Global Patent Index - EP 1144571 A3

EP 1144571 A3 2002-11-20 - AQUEOUS HEAVY DUTY LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MODIFIED ALKYLBENZENE SULFONATES

Title (en)

AQUEOUS HEAVY DUTY LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MODIFIED ALKYLBENZENE SULFONATES

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE VOLLWASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND MODIFIZIERTE ALKYLBENZYLSULFONATE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE DETERGENTS LIQUIDES PUISSANTS A BASE AQUEUSE, COMPRENANT DES SULFONATES D'ALKYLBENZENE MODIFIES

Publication

EP 1144571 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99968121 A

Priority

  • US 9929717 W
  • US 11649799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0043473A2] The present invention relates to aqueous based heavy-duty liquid detergent compositions containing a modified alkylbenzene sulfonate surfactant (MABS), a co-surfactant (alkyl polyhydroxy fatty acid amide and/or alkyl amidopropyldimethyl amine) and an aqueous liquid carrier. The MABS comprise a mixture of specific branched and non-branched alkylbenzene sulfonate compounds, which are further characterised by a 2/3-phenyl index of 275-10000.

[origin: WO0043473A2] This invention relates to hard surface cleaning compositions which include modified alkylbenzene sulfonate surfactant mixtures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 15/107 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/40 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/65 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 11/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/04 (2013.01); C11D 1/652 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/528 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0043473 A2 20000727; WO 0043473 A3 20021003; AU 2480100 A 20000807; BR 9916940 A 20011120; CA 2358856 A1 20000727; EP 1144571 A2 20011017; EP 1144571 A3 20021120; JP 2003518518 A 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 1/22 A

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.