Global Patent Index - EP 1144708 A3

EP 1144708 A3 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR COATING HOLLOW BODIES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR COATING HOLLOW BODIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON HOHLKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECOUVREMENT DE CORPS CREUX

Publication

EP 1144708 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99967878 A

Priority

  • DE 9903942 W
  • DE 19856901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19856901A1] The invention relates to a method for coating hollow bodies in which a powder mixture is prepared that is comprised of a metal dispensing powder, of an inert charging powder, and of an activator powder consisting of a metal halogenide. The powder mixture is brought into contact with an inner surface of the hollow body to be coated and is heated. In order to increase the thicknesses of the inner layer, the inert charging powder is prepared with an average particle size which is approximately the same size as the average particle size of the metal dispensing powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2013.01); C23C 24/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856901 A1 20000615; DE 19856901 C2 20030116; EP 1144708 A2 20011017; EP 1144708 A3 20020911; EP 1144708 B1 20030305; ES 2192415 T3 20031001; US 6887519 B1 20050503; WO 0034547 A2 20000615; WO 0034547 A3 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1144708E

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192415 T3

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904502 P 20030410

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010609

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.