Global Patent Index - EP 1144710 A3

EP 1144710 A3 2001-12-05 - ELECTRON BEAM PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND CONTROL PANEL THEREFOR

Title (en)

ELECTRON BEAM PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND CONTROL PANEL THEREFOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRONENSTRAHL-PVD VORRICHTUNG UND SEINE STEUERTAFEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DEPOT EN PHASE GAZEUSE PAR PROCEDE PHYSIQUE A FAISCEAU ELECTRONIQUE ET PANNEAU DE COMMANDE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1144710 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00975181 A

Priority

  • US 0021131 W
  • US 14722999 P
  • US 62175400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0111103A2] An electron beam physical vapor deposition apparatus (10) for producing a coating on an article (20). The apparatus (10) generally includes a coating chamber (12) that is operable at elevated temperatures and subatmospheric pressures. An electron beam gum (30) projects an electron beam (28) into the coating chamber (12) and onto a coating material (26) within the chamber (12), causing the coating material (26) to melt and evaporate. The operation of the EBPVD apparatus (10) is enhanced by a control panel (118) with which components of the apparatus (10) can be monitored and controlled. The control panel (118) includes a schematic of the apparatus (10) and its components, with indicia (120) of the components, visual indicators associated with the indicia (120) for indicating the operating status of the components, and controls (124) associated with the indicia (120) and adjacent the visual indicators for changing the operation of the corresponding component of the EBPVD apparatus (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 14/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/00 (2006.01); C23C 14/30 (2006.01); C23C 14/56 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 14/30 (2013.01); C23C 14/566 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0111103 A2 20010215; WO 0111103 A3 20010816; EP 1144710 A2 20011017; EP 1144710 A3 20011205; JP 2003522291 A 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060226

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 14/30 A

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.