Global Patent Index - EP 1144867 A3

EP 1144867 A3 2002-09-11 - PUMP

Title (en)

PUMP

Title (de)

PUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE

Publication

EP 1144867 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99952361 A

Priority

  • DE 9902508 W
  • DE 29823904 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0009887A2] The invention relates to a pump for delivering a fluid, especially a vane-cell pump, comprising a delivery device (1) which is accommodated in a casing (2). The casing (2) is closed on one side by a casing cover (3), and the other side is connected to a bearing flange (4). An input shaft (11) passes through the bearing flange (4), the delivery device (1) and optionally through the casing cover (3). In addition, said input shaft is mounted in a passage which is configured in the bearing flange (4) and optionally configured in the casing cover (3). A side plate (16, 17) which is supported against the inner wall, and which centers the delivery device (1) in the casing (3) is respectively arranged between the delivery device (1) and the inner wall of the bearing flange (4) and optionally of the casing cover (3). The aim of the invention is to provide an easy centering of the side plate (16, 17), especially while reducing reference tolerances with regard to the casing (2). To this end, the side plate (16, 17) is centered directly in the passage for the input shaft (11) on the side facing the bearing flange (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F03C 2/00 (2006.01); F04C 2/00 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F04C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/108 (2013.01); F04C 2230/603 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0009887 A2 20000224; WO 0009887 A3 20020425; DE 19981556 B4 20100318; DE 19981556 D2 20010613; EP 1144867 A2 20011017; EP 1144867 A3 20020911; EP 1144867 B1 20031112; JP 2002542416 A 20021210; JP 4452406 B2 20100421; US 6413063 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150813

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150813

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150813

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.