Global Patent Index - EP 1145056 A3

EP 1145056 A3 2002-09-11 - CIRCULARLY POLARIZED FIBER IN OPTICAL CIRCUITS

Title (en)

CIRCULARLY POLARIZED FIBER IN OPTICAL CIRCUITS

Title (de)

ZIRKULAR POLARISIERTE LICHTLEITFASER IN OPTISCHEN SCHALTUNGEN

Title (fr)

FIBRE A POLARISATION CIRCULAIRE POUR CIRCUITS OPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1145056 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99948142 A

Priority

  • US 9920473 W
  • US 10075798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0016139A2] The invention is directed to circularly polarized single mode waveguide fiber and to high data rate, multiplexed transmission systems that employ this fiber. The circularly polarized waveguide fiber attenuates the non-linear effects present in such high performance transmission links. In particular, self phase modulation is attenuated by more than 30 % and four wave mixing is essentially eliminated. This latter effect occurs because four wave mixing does not occur when a multiplexed link is made of a plurality of circularly polarized waveguide fibers which are arranged so that adjacent fibers have opposite circular polarization. The circularly polarized fiber enhances the non-linear effect of cross phase modulation, a feature that can be used in optical switching components associated with the transmission link. In addition, the strength of the XPM in CPF is independent of the relative polarization states of the signal and control pulses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/10; G02F 1/35; H04J 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02 (2006.01); G02B 6/024 (2006.01); G02B 6/10 (2006.01); G02F 1/365 (2006.01); H04B 10/2543 (2013.01); H04B 10/532 (2013.01); H04J 14/02 (2006.01); H04J 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/2543 (2013.01); G02B 6/105 (2013.01); H04B 10/532 (2013.01); H04J 14/02 (2013.01); H04J 14/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0016139 A2 20000323; WO 0016139 A3 20011122; AU 6137899 A 20000403; CA 2344682 A1 20000323; CN 1406342 A 20030326; EP 1145056 A2 20011017; EP 1145056 A3 20020911; JP 2002525647 A 20020813; TW 459148 B 20011011

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050819

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.