Global Patent Index - EP 1145121 A3

EP 1145121 A3 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR ASYNCHRONOUS DATA TRANSMISSION, WITH CHARACTERISTICS OF ATOMICITY, COHERENCE, INSULATION AND DURABILITY (ACID)

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ASYNCHRONOUS DATA TRANSMISSION, WITH CHARACTERISTICS OF ATOMICITY, COHERENCE, INSULATION AND DURABILITY (ACID)

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ASYNCHRONEN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN MIT ACID EIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION ASYNCHRONE D'INFORMATIONS, POSSEDANT LES PROPRIETES ACID

Publication

EP 1145121 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00958660 A

Priority

  • FR 0002292 W
  • FR 9910516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0113225A2] The invention concerns a method for asynchronous data transmission between a provider and a consumer, in accordance with ACID characteristics, the supplier and the consumer being connected by a communication channel chain. Said method is characterised in that the data are transmitted through independent transactions established: between the supplier and a first communication channel of the chain; between each of the communication channels of the chain; and between the last communication channel of the chain and the consumer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/466 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0113225 A2 20010222; WO 0113225 A3 20010830; AU 7010900 A 20010313; EP 1145121 A2 20011017; EP 1145121 A3 20020911; JP 2003507789 A 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.